RI S2672 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables children with significant speech impediments to attend the Rhode Island School for the Deaf.
Title
School For The Deaf
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/13/2016) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2672.pdf |