RI S2656 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the town of West Greenwich to create five (5) year tax liens on real estate owned by infirm and indigent persons in lieu of paying regular taxes where those persons have been determined as unable to pay by the assessor.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation - Exemption For Indigent And Infirm Persons In The Town Of West Greenwich
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |