RI S2647 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- CONDOMINIUM LAW - Requires the recording of the bylaws and rules of the association in the land evidence records of the city or town the condominium is located in and require amendments to the original filings to be certified by 2 or more members of the executive board.
Title
Requires the recording of the bylaws and rules of the association in the land evidence records of the city or town the condominium is located in and require amendments to the original filings to be certified by 2 or more members of the executive board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2647.pdf |