RI S2639 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that school district safety assessments be provided to the Rhode Island school safety committee every three (3) years for review and recommendations.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |