RI S2638 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a change in the definition of housing presumed to be in compliance with lead-safe laws. It includes dwelling units constructed after 1950 on federally-owned or leased lands in the definition.
Title
Lead Hazard Mitigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-02 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |