RI S2627 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of more than one bipartisan pair of poll supervisors which should help eliminate lines.
Title
Wardens And Supervisors
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2016) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2016) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |