RI S2620 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the estate of a person 55 years or older, to provide the heath and human services executive office proof of the probate petition, upon appointment of a fiduciary.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2620.pdf |