RI S2618 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Retail Liquor Licenses (would Authorize The City Of Providence To Create A Class To Liquor License To A Take Out Restaurant, Located In Plat Book 68, Lot 732, Within Two Hundred Feet (200') Of A Place Of Public Worship)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Retail Liquor Licenses (would Authorize The City Of Providence To Create A Class To Liquor License To A Take Out Restaurant, Located In Plat Book 68, Lot 732, Within Two Hundred Feet (200') Of A Place Of Public Worship)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-04 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-18 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2010-05-13 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2618.pdf |