RI S2617 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Inspection Of Dams (would Expand The Ability Of The Director Of The Department Of Environmental Management To Regulate Water Dam Safety)
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Inspection Of Dams (would Expand The Ability Of The Director Of The Department Of Environmental Management To Regulate Water Dam Safety)
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Francis Maher [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-05-16 | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2617.pdf |