RI S2610 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE PROVIDER COMPENSATION ACT - Expands health insurance commissioner's authority to set reimbursement rates for mental health services.
Title
Expands health insurance commissioner's authority to set reimbursement rates for mental health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2610.pdf |