RI S2599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes administrative fees upon individuals who fail to make timely payments of toll amounts, and subjects toll evaders to license suspension or fines pursuant to jurisdiction of the Rhode Island traffic tribunal.
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |