RI S2598 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Allows the town council of Portsmouth, by ordinance or resolution, to exempt Quaker Manor from valuation for taxation or to enter into tax abatement or payment in lieu of taxes agreements.
Title
Allows the town council of Portsmouth, by ordinance or resolution, to exempt Quaker Manor from valuation for taxation or to enter into tax abatement or payment in lieu of taxes agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |