RI S2579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enables the Rhode Island Public Rail Corporation to lower the self-insured retention amount required of the state and would provide indemnification statewide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Public Rail Corporation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-04-24SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/24/2018)
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-20SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback