RI S2579 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of BHDDH to certify recovery housing facilities and programs for substance use treatment. Also, after October 1, 2016 only certified recovery housing will be eligible to receive state funding to deliver recovery housing services.
Title
Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub B |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |