RI S2574 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To The United Way Of Rhode Island For The 2-1-1 Human Services Hotline (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 To The United Way Of Rhode Island To Provide Operational Support For The 2-1-1 System.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $500,000 TO THE UNITED WAY OF RHODE ISLAND FOR THE 2-1-1 HUMAN SERVICES HOTLINE (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $500,000 to the United Way of Rhode Island to provide operational support for the 2-1-1 system.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee continued |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2574.pdf |