RI S2572 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of elementary and secondary education to promulgate rules and regulations regarding graduation requirements for public school students fourteen (14) years of age or older who are under the care and control of the state.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/26/2016) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |