RI S2547 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate and amend certain notice requirements to parties in interest in the probate of a will or letters of administration but in no way would limit the discretion of the court to order any notice it deems necessary.
Title
Practice In Probate Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Practice in probate courts approval of amendment lc 004845/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |