RI S2533 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Committee transferred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands certain rights of persons with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-05-02HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-01SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-12SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback