RI S2530 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting Continued Focus And Actions For Improved Coordination Between Agencies Responsible For Early Childhood And Early Learning Programs
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION SUPPORTING CONTINUED FOCUS AND ACTIONS FOR IMPROVED COORDINATION BETWEEN AGENCIES RESPONSIBLE FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD AND EARLY LEARNING PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2530.pdf |