RI S2528 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT - Adds the Rhode Island teacher of the year as a voting member on the Rhode Island Board of Education.
Title
Adds the Rhode Island teacher of the year as a voting member on the Rhode Island Board of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2528.pdf |