RI S2526 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Household Hazardous Waste Management Act to create a comprehensive system for the disposal of hard-to-dispose hazardous household materials.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/11/2016) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |