RI S2519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PREKINDERGARTEN EDUCATION ACT - Allows municipalities participating in the state prekindergarten program to accept students from outside the municipality under certain conditions and establishes a lottery for enrollment in the program.
Title
Allows municipalities participating in the state prekindergarten program to accept students from outside the municipality under certain conditions and establishes a lottery for enrollment in the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2519.pdf |