RI S2519 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes orange or otherwise brightly colored plugs or tips inserted into the barrel of any firearm into the definition of "mark of identification" for those persons who change, alter, remove, or obliterate any mark of identification on a firearm.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2519.pdf |