RI S2509 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a ($1.00) fee per covered life per month to be paid when filing the annual report required of third party administrators of pharmacy benefit plans. The funds will go into a restricted receipt account and would be spent on opioid disorders.
Title
Pharmacy Freedom Of Choice - Fair Competition And Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2509.pdf |