RI S2481 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2481.pdf |