RI S2480 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts agencies of municipalities and the state from releasing information as to the residency of municipal or state police officers regarding public records requests.
Title
Relating To Public Records
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2480.pdf |