RI S2475 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the protections and remedies for employees against employers who pay wage differentials based on race, color, religion, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, disability; age or country of ancestral origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Employment Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Senate - Fair employment practices approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseReferred to House Labor
2018-04-10SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-29SenateScheduled for consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback