RI S2473 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKPLACE PSYCHOLOGICAL SAFETY ACT - Protects bullying/psychological abuse in workplace inflicted upon employees by employers/co-employees/provides civil remedies to affected employees/fines against employers/imprisonment/fines against co-employees.
Title
Protects bullying/psychological abuse in workplace inflicted upon employees by employers/co-employees/provides civil remedies to affected employees/fines against employers/imprisonment/fines against co-employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |