RI S2473 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the auditor general to oversee an audit of Medicaid programs administered by managed care organizations and submit a report of such findings within six (6) months to the general assembly and EOHHS.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee heard |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/14/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2473.pdf |