RI S2469 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- ELECTRICIANS - Amends the state's apprenticeship laws to make them more consistent with applicable federal regulations and makes said laws more comprehendible and consistent with each other.
Title
Amends the state's apprenticeship laws to make them more consistent with applicable federal regulations and makes said laws more comprehendible and consistent with each other.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2024) |
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |