RI S2462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation (would Fund Economic Development In Municipally-designated State Approved Growth Centers By Excluding Revenue Greater Than The Amount Collected In Fiscal Year 2011 From The Levy Subject To The Cap In An Amount Up To A Maximum Of 2% Of The Total Municipal)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation (would Fund Economic Development In Municipally-designated State Approved Growth Centers By Excluding Revenue Greater Than The Amount Collected In Fiscal Year 2011 From The Levy Subject To The Cap In An Amount Up To A Maximum Of 2% Of The Total Municipal)
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2462.pdf |