RI S2458 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- CONDUCT OF ELECTION AND VOTING EQUIPMENT, AND SUPPLIES - Includes the general assembly elections within the category of elections subject to the risk-limiting audits within the jurisdiction of the board of elections.
Title
Includes the general assembly elections within the category of elections subject to the risk-limiting audits within the jurisdiction of the board of elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2458.pdf |