RI S2455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation (would Exempt The Trade-in Value Of Pickup Trucks Under 6,000 Lbs Gross Weight From Sales Tax As Presently Available To Automobiles.)
Title
An Act Relating To Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation (would Exempt The Trade-in Value Of Pickup Trucks Under 6,000 Lbs Gross Weight From Sales Tax As Presently Available To Automobiles.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Glenford Shibley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-22 | Committee heard | |
2012-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2455.pdf |