RI S2454 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- EXPUNGEMENT OF CRIMINAL RECORDS - Permits those persons with felony convictions to have up to six misdemeanor offenses expunged from their criminal record.
Title
Permits those persons with felony convictions to have up to six misdemeanor offenses expunged from their criminal record.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2454.pdf |