RI S2450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsets provision allowing first-time violators to avoid fine by acquisition of hands-free device prior to imposition of fine effective 9/1/20.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2450.pdf |