RI S2446 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows any voter who has designated their political party affiliation to change that affiliation on or before the 30th day preceding any primary.
Title
Relating To Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |