RI S2439 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Climate Risk Reduction Act (would Provide For Measures To Protect And Move The State To An Active Response To Climate Change Impacts, By Identifying Some Of The Most Critical Issues That Will Have To Be Addressed)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Climate Risk Reduction Act (would Provide For Measures To Protect And Move The State To An Active Response To Climate Change Impacts, By Identifying Some Of The Most Critical Issues That Will Have To Be Addressed)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-02 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-06-01 | Senate passed Sub A as amended | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-04-07 | Committee heard | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2439.pdf |