RI S2436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes student privacy rights with institutional or personal technology devices and establishes criteria that school officials must follow to access a student's technology device and provides penalties for failure to follow the restrictions.
Title
Student Computer Device Privacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |