RI S2436 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2012 (would Establish The Ri Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2012 To Encourage The Expansion And Development Of The State's Harbors, Ports, And Related Infrastructure.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2012 (would Establish The Ri Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2012 To Encourage The Expansion And Development Of The State's Harbors, Ports, And Related Infrastructure.)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | |
2012-05-31 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-29 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2012-05-21 | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2012) | |
2012-02-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2436.pdf |