RI S2429 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- OBSCENE AND OBJECTIONABLE PUBLICATIONS AND SHOWS - Establishes, as an affirmative defense to the crimes of circulating obscene publications or shows and selling or exhibiting obscene publications to minors, the person's employment status as an employee of a school, museum, or library.
Title
Establishes, as an affirmative defense to the crimes of circulating obscene publications or shows and selling or exhibiting obscene publications to minors, the person's employment status as an employee of a school, museum, or library.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2429.pdf |