RI S2417 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot)
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |