RI S2415 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all executive branch agencies and departments to establish and administer a teleworking program to allow their employees to work at a different location, than their ordinary principal work location.
Title
Merit System - Teleworking Program
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2415.pdf |