RI S2413 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the "building height" definition in chapter 24 of title 45 (zoning ordinances) for property in special flood hazard areas. The building height would be measured from the base flood elevation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Ordinances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-03-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06SenateMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback