RI S2411 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school lunch service contracts to provide for payment to school-lunch workers and aides for one hundred eight (180) days or the length of the contract for the school year, whichever is longer.
Title
Federal Aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |