RI S2411 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides immunity to any person that provides food or wild game to a food pantry, food bank or DEM for ultimate distribution to needy individuals.
Title
Procedure Generally
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. John Pagliarini [R] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2411.pdf |