RI S2408 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES -- PROMOTION OF NEIGHBORHOOD CHARACTER AND SMART GROWTH - Amends several sections of chapter 24 of title 45, entitled "zoning ordinances," also known as the "Rhode Island zoning enabling act of 1991," with the intent of preserving neighborhood character and promoting smart growth.
Title
Amends several sections of chapter 24 of title 45, entitled "zoning ordinances," also known as the "Rhode Island zoning enabling act of 1991," with the intent of preserving neighborhood character and promoting smart growth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Towns And Cities
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES -- PROMOTION OF NEIGHBORHOOD CHARACTER AND SMART GROWTH
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES -- PROMOTION OF NEIGHBORHOOD CHARACTER AND SMART GROWTH
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2408.pdf |