RI S2407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes in the practice of physical therapy ordering diagnostic images and studies provided they are performed and interpreted by other licensed health care professionals.
Title
Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2407.pdf |