RI S2403 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the issuance of a warrant to obtain cell phone location information subject to emergency situation exceptions.
Title
Cell Phone Tracking
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |