RI S2391 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Relating To Johnson & Wales University
Title
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Relating To Johnson & Wales University
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Referred to House Finance | |
2012-06-05 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-05-31 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2012) | |
2012-03-14 | Senate held on desk | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/14/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-28 | Scheduled for consideration (03/01/2012) | |
2012-02-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2391.pdf |