RI S2384 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Require That The Person Nominated For Adjutant General Of The State Be Eligible For Promotion To Brigadier General, Or Hold That Rank Currently, And Have Served Not Less Than 5 Years In The Ri National Guard.)
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Require That The Person Nominated For Adjutant General Of The State Be Eligible For Promotion To Brigadier General, Or Hold That Rank Currently, And Have Served Not Less Than 5 Years In The Ri National Guard.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | House voted to recommit to House Veterans Affairs | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to House Veterans Affairs | |
2012-05-10 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-03 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/10/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-04-30 | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2012) | |
2012-03-13 | Meeting postponed (03/21/2012) | |
2012-03-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2384.pdf |